Hacala v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Hacala
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., John Doe 3, John Doe 2, Sincerely Nuts, Inc. and John Doe 1
Case Number: 5:2019cv05131
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint filed by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
September 6, 2019 Filing 44 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #43 Defendant Amazon.com, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss. Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. is directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to its motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 6, 2019. (mer)
September 6, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to file a reply in support of its motion to dismiss by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss)(Marts, Gary)
September 5, 2019 Filing 42 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
September 5, 2019 Filing 41 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #39 Separate Defendant, Sincerely Nuts, Inc.'s Motion for Leave to file a reply. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 5, 2019. (mer)
September 4, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #39 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply and Incorporated Brief in Support of Sincerely Nuts' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint)(Hildebrand, Rachel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
September 4, 2019 Filing 38 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial re-set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 4, 2019. (jas)
August 30, 2019 Filing 37 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Amazon.Com, Inc.. Amendment to #34 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting /Parties' Joint Amendment to Plaintiff's Rule 26(f) Conference Report. (Lowther, Edwin)
August 30, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SINCERELY NUTS MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
August 30, 2019 Filing 35 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO AMAZONS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
August 29, 2019 Filing 34 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
August 19, 2019 Filing 33 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Second Amended Complaint by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
August 19, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
August 19, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
August 8, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Dustin Doty on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Doty, Dustin)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #10 Motion to Dismiss; DENYING AS MOOT #12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 7, 2019. (lgd)
August 6, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie L. Hussey on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Hussey, Julie)
August 5, 2019 Filing 26 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Amended Complaint against All Defendants SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Stephen P. Hacala. Related document: #3 Amended Complaint filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Plunkett, Clifford) Modified document title on 8/6/2019 (jas).
August 5, 2019 Filing 25 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO AMAZONS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
August 5, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO SINCERELY NUTS MOTION TO DISMISS filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
August 1, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Edwards, Jr on behalf of Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Edwards, William)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Sincerely Nuts, Inc.'s brief (Doc. 11) may exceed the page limit imposed by the Court's Initial Scheduling Order. Additionally, Plaintiff's response to Sincerely Nuts, Inc.'s motion to dismiss may exceed the page limit by not more than seven (7) pages. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 1, 2019. (rjs)
August 1, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Hildebrand, Rachel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua C. Ashley on behalf of Stephen P. Hacala. (Ashley, Joshua)
July 31, 2019 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Julie L. Hussey is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 31, 2019. (jas)
July 31, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Attorney Julie L. Hussey to Appear Pro Hac Vice Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.'s Rule 83.5 Application to Make Special Appearance (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-1955151) by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Julie L. Hussey)(Marts, Gary)
July 29, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint, filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
July 25, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint, filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
July 25, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, and Amended Complaint, filed by Stephen P. Hacala. (Plunkett, Clifford)
July 23, 2019 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2019. Jury Trial set for 6/8/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 23, 2019. (jas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by William H. Edwards, Jr. on behalf of Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel) Modified on 7/23/2019 to edit attorney(tg).
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel E. Hildebrand on behalf of Sincerely Nuts, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Rachel)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kael K Bowling on behalf of Stephen P. Hacala. (Bowling, Kael)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
July 17, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE in Removal Case re Service of Process directing Plaintiff Stephen P. Hacala to file affidavits of service (or copies of proof of service filed in state court) for defendant(s) who have already been served with summons and a copy of the complaint, and file proof of service in this court regarding defendant(s) to be served in the future. If service is not perfected on a defendant within 90 days after filing the complaint, a show cause order will issue and the complaint against that defendant is subject to dismissal pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 4(m) (tg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Marts, Jr on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Marts, Gary)
July 16, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Amazon.Com, Inc.. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Gary Marts, Jr., Dustin K. Doty and Julie L. Hussey. (tg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (tg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Sincerely Nuts, Inc., John Doe 1, Amazon.Com, Inc., John Doe 3, John Doe 2, filed by Stephen P. Hacala.(tg) Modified on 7/18/2019 (tg).
July 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Amazon.Com, Inc.. (tg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington, County, case number 72CV-19-627. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 5007050), filed by Amazon.Com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B State pleadings)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hacala v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Edwin Lee Lowther, Jr.
Represented By: Julie L. Hussey
Represented By: Dustin Doty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sincerely Nuts, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Edwards, Jr.
Represented By: Rachel E. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen P. Hacala
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Represented By: Joshua C. Ashley
Represented By: Kael K Bowling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?