Wilson et al v. Cognosante, LLC
Plaintiff: Greg Wilson and Tonya Mowan
Defendant: Cognosante, LLC
Case Number: 5:2019cv05147
Filed: August 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 12/2/2019 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/12/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 30, 2019. (slc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cognosante, LLC. (Rhoads, Robert)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cognosante, LLC.(Rhoads, Robert)
September 6, 2019 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Cognosante, LLC. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer #9 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorneys, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Raymond Baldwin, Jeffrey Glaser,. (src)
September 5, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Defendant Cognosante, LLC. Answer or other responsive pleading due 9/27/2019. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on September 5, 2019. (ee)
September 5, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Cognosante, LLC. (Rhoads, Robert)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Rhoads on behalf of Cognosante, LLC. (Rhoads, Robert)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Tonya Mowan, Greg Wilson Consent to Join Collective Action - - Tonya Mowan (Burks, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Tonya Mowan, Greg Wilson Consent to Join Collective Action - - Greg Wilson (Burks, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Complaint filing fee paid re #1 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-1959510.. (Burks, Christopher)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Cognosante, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Cognosante, LLC for service of the following document: #1 Complaint. (Burks, Christopher)
August 6, 2019 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
August 6, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/8/2019 (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Tonya Mowan, Greg Wilson. (src)
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cognosante, LLC, filed by Greg Wilson, Tonya Mowan.(src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson et al v. Cognosante, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Wilson
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Represented By: Christopher Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonya Mowan
Represented By: Brandon M. Haubert
Represented By: Christopher Burks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cognosante, LLC
Represented By: Robert K. Rhoads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?