Buhl v. Reynerson
Plaintiff: Brandi Buhl
Defendant: R. Jeffrey Reynerson
Case Number: 5:2019cv05154
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Dismissing Case with prejudice (see Order for specifics). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 31, 2020. (lgd)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 28, 2020. (Attachments: #1 consent form)(rg)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY Minute Entry for proceedings held before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann: Settlement Conference held on 8/27/2020. (Proceedings held in Fayetteville-Room 210-via video conference) (rg)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Hearings *VIA VIDEO CONFERENCE*: Settlement Conference set for 8/27/2020 12:00 PM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to ELWsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 11, 2020. (rg)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION and ORDER granting in part #32 Motion for Attorney Fees, in favor of Brandi Buhl against R. Jeffrey Reynerson in the amount of $2,870.00 (see order for specifics). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 5, 2020. (src)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #32 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Responses)(Littleton, David)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Brandi Buhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thompson Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Task-Based Itemized Statement of Fees, #3 Exhibit C - US-Consumer-Law-Attorney-Fee-Survey-Report-2017-2018)(Thompson, Russell)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 OPINION AND ORDER denying #20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 8, 2020. (tg)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #28 Response to Motion by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Littleton, David)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Littleton, David)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ORDER. The deadline for the parties to conduct Plaintiff's deposition is fourteen days after the Court's ruling on the pending motion to compel. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 30, 2020. (rjs)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STATEMENT OF FACTS in support of #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brandi Buhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Responses to First RFAs, #2 Exhibit B - Responses to First RFPs, #3 Exhibit C - Responses to Second RFPs)(Thompson, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION to Compel Renewed filed by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION to Compel Renewed filed by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION to Compel Renewed by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Littleton, David)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Compel Renewed by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery, #2 Exhibit Discovery, #3 Exhibit Letter)(Littleton, David)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #18 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand by R. Jeffrey Reynerson.(Littleton, David)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint against R. Jeffrey Reynerson , filed by Brandi Buhl. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Brandi Buhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 14, 2019 letter with Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - April 10, 2019 Dispute Letter, #3 Exhibit C - May 15, 2019 Default Judgment, #4 Exhibit 1 - Consent to Filing First Amended Complaint)(Thompson, Russell)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE by Brandi Buhl of filing First Amended Complaint (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit A - March 14, 2019 letter with Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - April 10, 2019 Dispute Letter, #4 Exhibit C - May 15, 2019 Default Judgment)(Thompson, Russell)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw Defendant's Motion to Compel. Before filing a renewed motion to compel, the parties must follow the procedures outlined in the Final Scheduling Order. See Doc. 11, p. 1 ("A good faith effort means, at a minimum, an in-person or telephone conversation with opposing counsel.").Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 9, 2020. (rjs)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Withdraw #13 Memorandum Brief in Support, #12 MOTION to Compel by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Littleton, David)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #12 MOTION to Compel filed by Brandi Buhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Thompson Declaration)(Thompson, Russell)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #12 MOTION to Compel by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Littleton, David)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Compel by R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Discovery Responses, #2 Exhibit Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit GFL)(Littleton, David)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III.Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 17, 2019. (jas)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Brandi Buhl. (Thompson, Russell)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/30/2019. Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 20, 2019. (jas)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by R. Jeffrey Reynerson.(Littleton, David)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by David A. Littleton on behalf of R. Jeffrey Reynerson. (Littleton, David)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brandi Buhl. R. Jeffrey Reynerson served on 10/31/2019, answer due 11/21/2019. (Thompson, Russell)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to R. Jeffrey Reynerson and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to R. Jeffrey Reynerson, P.A. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Thompson, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against R. Jeffrey Reynerson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-1961892), filed by Brandi Buhl. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - March 14, 2019 letter with Summons and Complaint)(Thompson, Russell)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Brandi Buhl. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buhl v. Reynerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandi Buhl
Represented By: Russell Snow Thompson, IV
Represented By: Russell S Thompson, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jeffrey Reynerson
Represented By: David A. Littleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?