Tang v. WalMart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry Tang
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05021
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2020 Filing 22 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 5/27/2020 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 24, 2020. (slc)
March 20, 2020 Filing 21 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WalMart, Inc.. (Rahhal, Anthony)
March 20, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by WalMart, Inc.. (Rahhal, Anthony)
March 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary Ap Oubre on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (Oubre, Zachary)
March 13, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Rahhal on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (Rahhal, Anthony)
March 13, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Anthony L. Rahhal is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 13, 2020. (slc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Zachary A.P. Oubre is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 13, 2020. (slc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney Anthony L. Rahhal to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2100723) by WalMart, Inc.. (Turner, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Zachary A.P. Oubre to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2100698) by WalMart, Inc.. (Turner, William)
March 12, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica John Bowman on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (John Bowman, Jessica)
March 12, 2020 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Jessica JohnBowman is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 12, 2020. (slc)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Attorney Jessica JohnBowman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2099894) by WalMart, Inc.. (Turner, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. Defendant's responsive pleading must be filed on or before MARCH 23, 2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 27, 2020. (slc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by WalMart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Email Communication with Pltf Counsel)(Turner, William)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by William Kirk Turner on behalf of WalMart, Inc.. (Turner, William)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Larry Tang. WalMart, Inc. served on 2/10/2020, answer due 3/2/2020. (Gibby, Darrell)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL REPORT ON THE FILING OF A PATENT ACTION for a case initiated by Larry Tang with the filing of #2 Complaint,. (Gibby, Darrell)
January 28, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2067269.. (Gibby, Darrell)
January 28, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE to attorney(s) filing a complaint or amended complaint in a Patent action: Please complete AO Form 120 found on the U.S Courts website https://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms and file it with the Court using Other Filings-Other Documents-Initial Report.Copyright/Patent/Trademark Report due 2/18/2020. (lgd)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to WalMart, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
January 27, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 1/29/2020 (lgd)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Gibby, Darrell)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Larry Tang against WalMart, Inc., filed by Larry Tang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Patent, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - 4/26/17 letter, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - 6/7/17 letter, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - 3/2/19 letter, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - lists of accused chairs)(Gibby, Darrell)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Larry Tang. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tang v. WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Tang
Represented By: Darrell W. Gibby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?