Ali v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Sayed Ali
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2020cv05032
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 31, 2020. (jas)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Campbell, Katherine)
February 18, 2020 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 18, 2020. (jas)
February 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin A. Crass on behalf of Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Crass, Kevin)
February 17, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2081001.. (Campbell, Katherine)
February 14, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 2/18/2020 (tg)
February 14, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendant Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. Notice of Removal #1 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: KEVIN CRASS. (tg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER filed in State Court to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company.(tg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed in State Court with Jury Demand against Shelter Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Sayed Ali.(tg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (tg)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, case number 04CV-19-2802, filed by Shelter Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ali v. Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sayed Ali
Represented By: William Gene Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelter Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Kevin A. Crass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?