Sluss v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Plaintiff: Colleen Sluss
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05057
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. The answer or other responsive pleading is now due 5/22/2020. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 23, 2020. (ee)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Howard, John)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by John Gordon Howard on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Howard, John)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Colleen Sluss. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Colleen Sluss. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. served on 4/3/2020, answer due 4/24/2020. (Lacy, Brandon)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston and Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2109354), filed by Colleen Sluss.(Lacy, Brandon)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Colleen Sluss. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sluss v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Sluss
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: John Gordon Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?