Arkansas Nurses, LLC et al v. Green Dot Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Amedistaf, LLC and Arkansas Nurses, LLC
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation, Bank of Booneville and John Doe 1
Case Number: 5:2020cv05061
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 26, 2020. (lgd)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING in part #12 Motion for Protective Order. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 26, 2020. (lgd)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Amedistaf, LLC. (Horton, Johnathan)
May 13, 2020 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 1/25/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 13, 2020. (jas)
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Amedistaf, LLC, Arkansas Nurses, LLC. (Horton, Johnathan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Benjamin Stuart Nye is withdrawn and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 16, 2020. (rab)
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION of Benjamin S. Nye to Withdraw as Attorney for plaintiffs by Amedistaf, LLC, Arkansas Nurses, LLC. (Horton, Johnathan)
April 8, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Amedistaf, LLC, Arkansas Nurses, LLC. (Horton, Johnathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/13/2020. Bench Trial set for 1/25/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 7, 2020. (jas)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Green Dot Corporation.(Smith, Jason)
March 31, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2112696.. (Smith, Jason)
March 31, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/2/2020 (tg)
March 31, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT filed in State Court against Green Dot Corporation, John Doe 1, filed by Arkansas Nurses, LLC, Amedistaf, LLC.(tg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Green Dot Corporation. (tg)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-20-588., filed by Green Dot Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B State Court Notice)(tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arkansas Nurses, LLC et al v. Green Dot Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Dot Corporation
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of Booneville
Represented By: Jason C. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amedistaf, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: Benjamin Stuart Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arkansas Nurses, LLC
Represented By: Johnathan D. Horton
Represented By: Benjamin Stuart Nye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?