Kinney v. Bartholomew et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Kinney
Defendant: The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, Matthew Bartholomew and Gwendolyn Bartholomew
Case Number: 5:2020cv05083
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Christopher Kinney. (Shemin, Kenneth)
June 12, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave. Plaintiff Christopher Kinney is granted leave to file the Reply attached as Exhibit A to his Motion for Leave. Such Reply must be filed within two (2) business days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 12, 2020. (jdw)
June 12, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to by Christopher Kinney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Shemin, Kenneth)
June 9, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #16 Response to Motion to Remand by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #14 MOTION to Remand filed by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 MOTION to Remand by Christopher Kinney. (Shemin, Kenneth)
May 27, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand by Christopher Kinney. (Shemin, Kenneth)
May 26, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Required Party Under F.R. CIV.P.19 filed by Christopher Kinney. (Shemin, Kenneth)
May 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by William J Ogles on behalf of All Defendants. (Ogles, William)
May 11, 2020 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Required Party Under F.R. CIV.P.19 by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to Join a Required Party Under F.R. CIV.P.19 by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (Smith, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Smith, Michael)
May 8, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #7 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed in State Court on 5/4/20 by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (tg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed in State Court on 5/1/20 by Christopher Kinney. (tg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed in State Court on 4/29/20 by Christopher Kinney. (tg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed in State Court on 4/22/20 by Christopher Kinney. (tg)
May 4, 2020 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2133749.. (Smith, Michael)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
May 4, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/6/2020 (lgd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT and documents against Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC, filed by Christopher Kinney.(lgd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Matthew Bartholomew, Gwendolyn Bartholomew, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC. (lgd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-20-1038., filed by Gwendolyn Bartholomew, Matthew Bartholomew, The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC, RJ Investments Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Notice of filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court documents)(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kinney v. Bartholomew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bartholomew Insurance Agency, LLC
Represented By: John C. Everett
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RJ Investments Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John C. Everett
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Bartholomew
Represented By: John C. Everett
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gwendolyn Bartholomew
Represented By: John C. Everett
Represented By: Michael G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Kinney
Represented By: Kenneth R Shemin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?