Jernigan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Justin Jernigan
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2020cv05115
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:0405g
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Marisa Silverman on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Silverman, Marisa)
August 14, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Justin Jernigan. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/31/2020, answer due 9/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service for US Attorney of Western District of Arkansas, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service for Office of Regional Counsel, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service for US AG)(Gallo, Meghan)
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 ***DISREGARD DUPLICATE FILING*** REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Justin Jernigan. (Gallo, Meghan) Modified on 7/16/2020 (tg).
July 10, 2020 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable P. K. Holmes III and Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann, as the referral judge. (lgd)
July 10, 2020 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT to a District Judge for entry of the final judgment or order by Justin Jernigan. (Gallo, Meghan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to William Barr, U.S. Attorney General for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to U.S. Attorney's Office for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Gallo, Meghan)
July 7, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, : $ 400, receipt number BARWDC-2173020.. (Gallo, Meghan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 7/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 magistrate consent)(lgd)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Justin Jernigan.(Gallo, Meghan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Justin Jernigan. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jernigan v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Jernigan
Represented By: Meghan M Gallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of Regional Counsel-Dallas
Represented By: Marisa Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?