Wilson v. Koehler et al
Plaintiff: Joshua David Wilson
Defendant: Deputy Taylor, Deputy Gregory, Benton County Detention Center, John Doe Officers, Deputy Franks, Jailer Reese Koehler, Deputy Skaggs, Corporal Franks, Corporal Benjamin C. Vinson, Benton County Sheriff's Office and Sheriff Shawn Holloway
Case Number: 5:2020cv05125
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Filing 13 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Franks, Gregory, Shawn Holloway, Skaggs, Taylor, Benjamin C. Vinson and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #6 Amended Complaint, #12 Order Directing Service,. (src)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Deputy Franks, Deputy Gregory, Shawn Holloway, Deputy Skaggs, Deputy Taylor, Benjamin C. Vinson and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 24, 2020. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(src)
August 24, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #10 Motion for subpoena of documents. The Plaintiff's discovery motion is premature at this point. The Plaintiff can make his request after the Court enters its Initial Scheduling Order, but is cautioned that any request for subpoena must be specific with respect to dates and must be related to his claims. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 24, 2020. (cpg)
August 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to subpoena and request documents by Joshua David Wilson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Sheriff, Benton County to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $4.52; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Sheriff, Benton County Detention Center). (lgd)
August 5, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 5, 2020. (cpg)
August 5, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on August 5, 2020. (cpg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) against Skaggs, John Doe Officers, Gregory, Reese Koehler, Taylor, Franks, Benjamin C. Vinson, Shawn Holloway, filed by Joshua David Wilson. Related document: #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Joshua David Wilson.(tg)
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Joshua David Wilson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(tg)
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER that the matter has been provisionally filed as the undersigned finds that additional information is needed to rule on Plaintiff's IFP application. Specifically the Court requires the following information: completed and signed IFP. Failure to comply within the time period specified could result in summary dismissal for failure to obey a court order. (Completed IFP due by 8/3/2020), ORDER DIRECTING that an Amended Complaint be filed. ( Amended Complaint due by 8/3/2020); defendants Benton County Detention Center and Benton County Sheriff's Office terminated. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on July 17, 2020. (lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Joshua David Wilson. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Benton County Detention Center, Benton County Sheriff's Office, Franks, Gregory, John Doe Officers, Reese Koehler, Skaggs, Taylor, Benjamin C. Vinson, filed by Joshua David Wilson.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Koehler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jailer Reese Koehler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Skaggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Franks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Benjamin C. Vinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benton County Sheriff's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Shawn Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua David Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?