Salinas v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Maria Angela Salinas
Defendant: Chad Wolf, USCIS, U.S. DHS, Ken Cuccinelli, Christina Olguin, William P. Barr and Cindy Gomez
Case Number: 5:2020cv05134
Filed: July 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jordan Hummel on behalf of All Defendants. (Hummel, Jordan)
August 4, 2020 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to William P. Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Cindy Gomez, Christina Olguin, U.S. DHS, USCIS, Chad Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 4, 2020 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to WIlliam P. Barr for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Separate Summons Requested, #2 Supplement Separate Summons Requested, #3 Supplement Separate Summons Requested, #4 Supplement Separate Summons Requested, #5 Supplement Separate Summons Requested, #6 Supplement Separate Summons Requested)(Bogart, Nathan)
August 3, 2020 Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 400, receipt number AARWDC-2192032.. (Bogart, Nathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to William P. Barr for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Separate Summons Requested, #2 Separate Summons Requested, #3 Separate Summons Requested, #4 Separate Summons Requested, #5 Separate Summons Requested, #6 Separate Summons Requested)(Bogart, Nathan)
August 3, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
August 3, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/5/2020 (tg)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 ***DISREGARD - WRONG EVENT USED***AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Maria Angela Salinas. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Separate Summons, #2 Separate Summons, #3 Separate Summons, #4 Separate Summons, #5 Separate Summons, #6 Separate Summons)(Bogart, Nathan) Modified on 8/4/2020 (src).
July 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Maria Angela Salinas.(Bogart, Nathan)
July 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Maria Angela Salinas. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salinas v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. DHS
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Cuccinelli
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Olguin
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William P. Barr
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cindy Gomez
Represented By: Jordan Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Angela Salinas
Represented By: Nathan Randal Bogart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?