Barker v. Bill's Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maurice Barker
Defendant: Bill's Electric, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05153
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Bill's Electric, Inc. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 10/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support)(src)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maurice Barker. Bill's Electric, Inc. served on 9/2/2020, answer due 9/23/2020. (Sanford, Josh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Bill's Electric, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Bill's Electric, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sanford, Josh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AARWDC-2204872), filed by Maurice Barker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CTJ - Maurice Barker)(Sanford, Josh)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Maurice Barker. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barker v. Bill's Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maurice Barker
Represented By: Josh Sanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill's Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?