Morris v. Hewitt et al
Plaintiff: Mark Tod Morris
Defendant: Vincent Chadick, Dr. Mark Hewitt and public defender
Case Number: 5:2020cv05175
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Erin L Wiedemann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions - Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2020 Filing 13 Letter from Clerk regarding Appeal Filing Fee ( Completed IFP or filing fee due by 12/4/2020) (src)
November 13, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Opinion and Order by Mark Tod Morris. (Attachments: #1 8 USCA Letter)(src) Modified filed date per 8USCA letter on 11/18/2020 (src).
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 OPINION AND ORDER Dismissing Without Prejudice claims against Defendants. (See Order for Specifics). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 19, 2020. (lgd)
October 16, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER re 6 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY. The Show Cause Order was entered in error. The Clerk is directed to strike the Order 6 . Plaintiff has not been directed to file an amended complaint. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 16, 2020. (smg)
October 16, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Mark Tod Morris re 6 Order to Show Cause - Failure to Obey Order-TEXT ONLY. (lgd)
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER Directing the Clerk to change the style of the case and the case participant name to reflect the correct name of the Defendant as set forth in the #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983). The name of Defendant Vincent Chadick, Public Defender should be changed to Vincent Chadick, Attorney at Law. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 9, 2020. (smg)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DUPLICATE ENTRY*** TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order (ECF No. 3) directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by September 30, 2020. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2020. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 8, 2020. (smg) Modified text on 10/8/2020 (lgd).
October 8, 2020 Filing 6 ***STRICKEN PER TEXT ONLY ORDER DATED 10/16/2020***TEXT ONLY SHOW CAUSE ORDER - FAILURE TO OBEY ORDER. The Court entered an Order (ECF No. 3) directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint by September 30, 2020. Plaintiff did not respond. Plaintiff is given 21 days to show cause why he failed to obey the Order of the Court. If Plaintiff fails to respond by the deadline, this case shall be subject to dismissal. Show Cause Response due by 10/29/2020.Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on October 8, 2020. (smg) Modified on 10/16/2020 (lgd).
September 24, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing ADC North Central Unit to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $7.33; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: AR Board of Corrections, Compliance Division; Department of Correction, Trust Fund & Centralized Banking Office; Fiscal Manager, AR Department of Community Correction). (lgd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form mailed. (lgd)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350. Signed by Honorable Erin L. Wiedemann on September 24, 2020. (lgd) Modified on 9/24/2020 (tg). (tg).
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Mark Tod Morris. Motions referred to Erin L. Wiedemann.(lgd)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Vincent Chadick, Mark Hewitt, filed by Mark Tod Morris.(lgd) (lgd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Hewitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Chadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mark Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: public defender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Tod Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?