Baker v. Bentonville School District
Plaintiff: Rodney & Jayme Baker
Defendant: Bentonville School District and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2020cv05207
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 12, 2021. (jas)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Rodney & Jayme Baker. (Rozzell, George)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number CARWDC-2286400.. (Ney, Marshall)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/13/2021. Bench Trial set for 11/1/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 4, 2020. (jas)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Bentonville School District.(Ney, Marshall)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Bentonville School District, John Doe, and Summons filed by Rodney & Jayme Baker.(lgd)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bentonville School District. (lgd)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-20-1703., filed by Bentonville School District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint and summons)(lgd)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 12/7/2020 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Bentonville School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentonville School District
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney & Jayme Baker
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?