Tayor v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Plaintiff: Miranda Taylor
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2020cv05211
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Deportation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2021 Filing 14 JUDGMENT pursuant to the opinion and order entered in this case on this date, finding defendants Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc. are jointly and severally liable to Plaintiff Miranda Taylor. (See Judgment for Specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 2, 2021. (lgd)
February 2, 2021 Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER granting #10 Motion for Default Judgment. (See Order for Specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 2, 2021. (lgd)
January 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan P Hoffmann on behalf of All Defendants. (Hoffmann, Jonathan)
January 18, 2021 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Miranda Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(McGaha, Corey)
January 18, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Miranda Taylor. (McGaha, Corey)
January 6, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC. (src)
January 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Clerk as to Midland Funding LLC and Midland Credit Management, Inc. by Miranda Taylor. (McGaha, Corey)
January 5, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Complaint, filed by Miranda Taylor. Midland Credit Management, Inc. served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McGaha, Corey)
January 5, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and Complaint, filed by Miranda Taylor. Midland Funding LLC served on 12/14/2020, answer due 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(McGaha, Corey)
December 10, 2020 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Midland Credit Management, Inc., Midland Funding LLC, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
December 10, 2020 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Midland Credit Management, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (McGaha, Corey)
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Midland Funding LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (McGaha, Corey)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2289276), filed by Miranda Taylor.(McGaha, Corey) Modified party name on 12/10/2020 (src).
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Miranda Taylor. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg) Modified party name on 12/10/2020 (src).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tayor v. Midland Funding LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miranda Taylor
Represented By: Corey D. McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Funding LLC
Represented By: Jonathan P Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midland Credit Management, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan P Hoffmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?