Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Dooms et al
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Haley Rhodes, Adriana Pineda and Dillon Dooms
Case Number: 5:2021cv05034
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #23 Response to Motion by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Zachary)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Zachary)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Leave. Defendant Dillon Dooms is granted leave to file a Reply in support of its pending Motion to Dismiss #10 . Such Reply should be filed no later than 5:00 p.m. C.T. on April 12, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 9, 2021. (jdw) Modified text on 4/12/2021 (src).
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Reply by Dillon Dooms. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brooks, Courtney)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing set for 6/16/2021 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: All deadlines remain as stated in the Initial Scheduling Order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 8, 2021. (slc)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Adriana Pineda, Haley Rhodes. (White, Emily)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Adriana Pineda, Haley Rhodes.(White, Emily)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily L White on behalf of Adriana Pineda, Haley Rhodes. (White, Emily)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Adriana Pineda served on 4/3/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. (Hill, Zachary)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #14 Response to Motion by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Zachary)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Zachary)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/14/2021 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 30, 2021. (slc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Haley Rhodes served on 3/26/2021, answer due 4/16/2021. (Hill, Zachary)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dillon Dooms. (Brooks, Courtney)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dillon Dooms. (Brooks, Courtney)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment and Summons, filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Dillon Dooms served on 2/25/2021, answer due 3/18/2021. (Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Dillon Dooms, Adriana Pineda, Haley Rhodes and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Adriana Pineda for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Haley Rhodes for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Dillon Dooms for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Dillon Dooms, Adriana Pineda, Haley Rhodes ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2339452), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hill, Zachary)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Safeco Insurance Company of America. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safeco Insurance Company of America v. Dooms et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Haley Rhodes
Represented By: Emily L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adriana Pineda
Represented By: Emily L White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Dooms
Represented By: Courtney Alexa Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safeco Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Zachary Richmond Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?