Penn-Star Insurance Company v. ID, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Defendant: BG Artist Architect, LLC, Travis Getzendaner, Britt Gremillion, Chris Goddard, ID, LLC doing business as Manhattan Iron Door, an Arkansas Limited Liability Company and Goddard Design Group, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05043
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Caleb Scott Sugg on behalf of ID, LLC. (Sugg, Caleb)
April 12, 2021 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ID, LLC. (Wray, Scott)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, with Jury Demand by ID, LLC.(Wray, Scott)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Wray on behalf of ID, LLC. (Wray, Scott)
March 30, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/15/2021 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/19/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 30, 2021. (slc)
March 24, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint, by Travis Getzendaner.(Wales, Jason)
March 22, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 12 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to BG Artist Architect, LLC, Travis Getzendaner, Chris Goddard, Goddard Design Group, LLC, Britt Gremillion, ID, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
March 4, 2021 Filing 11 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ID, LLC for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 10 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to ID, LLC c/o Barry Ozturk for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Britt Gremillion for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Chris Goddard for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Goddard Design Group, LLC for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Travis Getzendaner for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to BG Artist Architect, LLC for service of the following document: #3 Complaint,. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
March 4, 2021 Filing 3 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2346859), filed by Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Penn-Star Policy PAV0076373, #2 Exhibit 2. Penn-Star Policy PAV0109366, #3 Exhibit 3. Washington County Complaint)(Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Neal Butler, Jr on behalf of Penn-Star Insurance Company. (Butler, Roger)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Penn-Star Insurance Company. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penn-Star Insurance Company v. ID, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BG Artist Architect, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Getzendaner
Represented By: Jason H Wales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Britt Gremillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID, LLC doing business as Manhattan Iron Door, an Arkansas Limited Liability Company
Represented By: Caleb Scott Sugg
Represented By: Scott E Wray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goddard Design Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Penn-Star Insurance Company
Represented By: Roger Neal Butler, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?