Sanabria v. WalMart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jose Sanabria
Defendant: WalMart, Inc. and Douglas Moppin
Case Number: 5:2021cv05060
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Douglas Moppin. #7 Motion for Default is terminated. (src)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to treat #7 MOTION for Default Judgment as a request for entry of a clerk's default pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(a). Plaintiff is advised that if all defendants are in default, then he may move for default judgment as per Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55(b). If instead one defendant has appeared, Plaintiff should wait to file a motion for default judgment until the merits of the entire action can be resolved, unless Plaintiff believes there is no just reason for delay under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 54(b). Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 22, 2021. (ee)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Douglas Moppin by Jose Sanabria. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Proof of Service of Summons on Defendant Moppin)(Scurlock, James)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, filed by Jose Sanabria. Douglas Moppin served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021. (Scurlock, James)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Douglas Moppin, WalMart, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Walmart, Inc. and Douglas Moppin for service of the following document: #2 Complaint, #1 Civil Cover Sheet,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Scurlock, James)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2357002), filed by Jose Sanabria.(Scurlock, James)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Jose Sanabria. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanabria v. WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Moppin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Sanabria
Represented By: James Monroe Scurlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?