Advocacy Trust, LLC v. Kia Motors Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Advocacy Trust, LLC
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc. and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 5:2021cv05064
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 17 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 13, 2021. (jas)
May 13, 2021 Filing 16 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (Jones, Jamie)
May 13, 2021 Filing 15 OPINION AND ORDER denying #10 Motion to Remand and Leave to Amend Complaint. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 13, 2021. (tg)
May 10, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Leave to Amend Complaint, #12 MOTION for Leave to REPLY TO DEF RESP TO PLTF MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REMAND filed by Advocacy Trust, LLC. (Mason, Samuel)
May 10, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Plaintiff is directed to immediately file the reply attached as an exhibit to the motion. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 10, 2021. (mer)
May 10, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to REPLY TO DEF RESP TO PLTF MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REMAND by Advocacy Trust, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A- PLTF REPLY TO DEF RESP TO PLTF MTN TO AMEND COMPLAINT AND REMAND)(Mason, Samuel)
May 5, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION to Remand and Leave to Amend Complaint and to Remand filed by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jones, Jamie) Modified on 5/6/2021 to edit text at the direction of Chambers (lw).
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand and Leave to Amend Complaint by Advocacy Trust, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXH 1-PROPOSED 2ND AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit EXH 2-MOTION TO NONSUIT CRAIN K OF NWA LLC)(Mason, Samuel)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/17/2021. Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 8, 2021. (jas)
April 8, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #6 Amended State Complaint with Jury Demand by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation.(lgd)
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (George, Robert) Modified text on 4/9/2021 (lgd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED STATE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc. filed by Advocacy Trust, LLC.(lgd) Modified text on 4/9/2021 (lgd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (George, Robert) Modified text on 4/9/2021 (lgd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2366227.. (Jones, Jamie) (lgd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
April 8, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-2020-2171-6., filed by Kia Motors Corporation, Kia Motors America, Inc.(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/8/2021: #1 Exhibit State Court documents) (lgd).
April 8, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Kia Motors America, Inc., Kia Motors Corporation. (lgd)
April 8, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Amended Complaint #6 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:John F. Romano, Andrew G. Moore. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lgd)
April 8, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 4/12/2021 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Advocacy Trust, LLC v. Kia Motors Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors Corporation
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Robert W. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kia Motors America, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Robert W. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Represented By: Jamie Huffman Jones
Represented By: Robert W. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Advocacy Trust, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Ryan Scott
Represented By: Frank H. Bailey
Represented By: Geoff Hamby
Represented By: Sach D Oliver
Represented By: Samuel Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?