K7 Design Group, Inc. v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: K7 Design Group, Inc.
Defendant: Walmart Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 5:2021cv05069
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 17 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/15/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/6/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 1, 2021. (slc)
May 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Katherine Calvert on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Calvert, Sarah)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent Chadick on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Chadick, Vincent)
May 26, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Ryan Younger on behalf of Walmart Inc.. (Younger, Robert)
May 26, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Tull, John)
May 26, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc..(Tull, John)
May 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David B Newman on behalf of K7 Design Group, Inc.. (Newman, David)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The new deadline for Defendant Walmart Inc. to file an answer or other responsive pleading is May 26, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 3, 2021. (ee)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. David B. Newman is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 3, 2021. (ee)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Walmart Inc.. (Tull, John)
April 16, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by K7 Design Group, Inc.. Walmart Inc. served on 4/14/2021, answer due 5/5/2021. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 13, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Walmart Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
April 13, 2021 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
April 13, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Wal Mart, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Attorney David B. Newman to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2368764) by K7 Design Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Walmart Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BARWDC-2368740), filed by K7 Design Group, Inc..(Dougherty, Kirkman)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by K7 Design Group, Inc. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K7 Design Group, Inc. v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K7 Design Group, Inc.
Represented By: Kynda Almefty
Represented By: Kirkman T. Dougherty
Represented By: David B Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Robert Ryan Younger
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Calvert
Represented By: John Earle Tull, III
Represented By: Vincent Chadick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?