Sightline Retail, LLC v. Quest USA Corp.
Plaintiff: Sightline Retail, LLC
Defendant: Quest USA Corp.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05082
Filed: May 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2021 Filing 24 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The sur-reply is due on July 12, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 1, 2021. (ee)
June 30, 2021 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File a Sur-Reply in Further Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
June 28, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT OF Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Quest USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signed Srour Declaration, #2 Exhibit Sommerfeld v Adesta, LLC)(Ney, Marshall)
June 18, 2021 Filing 21 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER re #19 Response to Motion. Plaintiff Sightline Retail, LLC, requests leave to file a sur-reply to Defendant's anticipated reply. The reply will not be filed until June 28. The Court is not yet persuaded that a sur-reply will be necessary. Accordingly, advance leave to file a sur-reply is not granted. Instead, Plaintiff is directed to review the reply once it is filed, determine whether a sur-reply is necessary, and then renew its motion for leave to file a sur-reply. The Court will grant the motion if a sur-reply would be helpful to the Court's understanding of the issues. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 10, 2021. (ee)
June 10, 2021 Filing 19 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration filed by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tabachnik, Douglas)
June 10, 2021 Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to file reply. The reply is due on June 28, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 10, 2021. (ee)
June 10, 2021 Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 8/16/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: All deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order remain. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 10, 2021. (slc)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Quest USA Corp.. (Ney, Marshall)
June 10, 2021 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Quest USA Corp.. (Ney, Marshall)
June 7, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Certification of Shannon Bedore)(Tabachnik, Douglas)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the Motion to Dismiss. The response is now due on JUNE 7, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 21, 2021. (ee)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 Memorandum Brief in Support, #6 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
May 14, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/14/2021 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/18/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 14, 2021. (slc)
May 13, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. DOUGLAS T. TABACHNIK appearing for PLAINTIFF. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 13, 2021. (slc)
May 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Attorney Douglas T. Tabachnik to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2389349) by Sightline Retail, LLC. (Tabachnik, Douglas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support Motion to Dismiss and to Compel Arbitration by Quest USA Corp.. (Ney, Marshall)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Quest USA Corp.. (Ney, Marshall)
May 5, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Church Campbell on behalf of Quest USA Corp.. (Campbell, Katherine)
May 5, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2383940.. (Ney, Marshall)
May 4, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
May 4, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Quest USA Corp., filed by Sightline Retail, LLC.(src)
May 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-21-400., filed by Quest USA Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 State Complaint)(src)
May 4, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Quest USA Corp.. (src)
May 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 5/6/2021 (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sightline Retail, LLC v. Quest USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quest USA Corp.
Represented By: Marshall S. Ney
Represented By: Katherine Church Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sightline Retail, LLC
Represented By: Burton S. Stacy, Jr.
Represented By: Burton Eulan Stacy, Jr
Represented By: Douglas T Tabachnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?