Simmons Pet Food, Inc. v. All American Pet Proteins, LLC
Plaintiff: Simmons Pet Food, Inc. and Simmons Pet Foods, Inc.
Defendant: All American Pet Proteins, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05117
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Filing 14 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Tarvin, Andrew)
August 2, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Tarvin, Andrew)
July 22, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Simmons Pet Foods, Inc.. (Wisley, P.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit A1, #3 Exhibit A2)(Tarvin, Andrew)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 19, 2021. (ee)
July 19, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to File Reply by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tarvin, Andrew)
July 12, 2021 Filing 8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Simmons Pet Foods, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Rob Tanksley, #2 Exhibit 2 - Arkansas SOS printout)(Wisley, P.)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/15/2021 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/5/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 1, 2021. (slc)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Tarvin, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Tarvin, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All American Pet Proteins, LLC, filed by Simmons Pet Food, Inc.(lgd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-20-2707., filed by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents, #2 Exhibit Order Vacating Dismissal, #3 Exhibit Jurisdictional Affidavit, #4 Exhibit state pleadings served)(lgd)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by All American Pet Proteins, LLC. (lgd)
June 28, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal, Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2417738.. (Tarvin, Andrew)
June 28, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/30/2021 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simmons Pet Food, Inc. v. All American Pet Proteins, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmons Pet Food, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Elrod
Represented By: P. Joshua Wisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Simmons Pet Foods, Inc.
Represented By: John R. Elrod
Represented By: P. Joshua Wisley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All American Pet Proteins, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Samuel Tarvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?