Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv05122
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 19 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 6/20/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 18, 2021. (jas)
August 18, 2021 Filing 18 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC. (Medlock, Jered)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Chacon, Zacarias)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Taylor, Don)
July 13, 2021 Filing 15 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/19/2021. Bench Trial set for 6/20/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 13, 2021.(jas)
July 13, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Federated Mutual Insurance Company.(Chacon, Zacarias)
July 7, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Zacarias Rodriguez Chacon on behalf of Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Chacon, Zacarias)
July 6, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading to July 14, 2021. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 6, 2021. (mer)
July 6, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Taylor, Don)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #9 Motion for Discovery. Defendant's amended notice of removal adequately alleges facts supporting jurisdiction. Should Plaintiff subsequently challenge those facts, the matter of jurisdictional discovery may be raised at that time. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 2, 2021. (rab)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Taylor, Don)
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Taylor, Don) Modified text on 7/6/2021 (lgd).
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Zacarias R. Chacon, Jr. is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter his appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 1, 2021. (jas)
July 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Zacarias R. Chacon, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Federated Mutual Insurance Company (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2419801) by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Taylor, Don)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing defendant to show cause why this case should not be remanded for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 7/2/2021. (See Order for specifics) Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 30, 2021. (lgd)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Federated Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC.(tg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (tg)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Washington County, case number 72CV-21-1172., filed by Federated Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(tg)
June 30, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #1 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2419362.. (Taylor, Don)
June 30, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/2/2021 (tg)
June 30, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC v. Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heart's Desire Precious Jewelry, LLC
Represented By: Jered Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federated Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Don Allen Taylor
Represented By: Zacarias Rodriguez Chacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?