Huff v. Chapman et al
Plaintiff: Helen Huff
Defendant: Lindsay Chapman and John Doe
Case Number: 5:2021cv05126
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Helen Huff. (Odom, Conrad)
July 23, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/28/2021 09:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/31/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 23, 2021. (slc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to #3 Amended Complaint by Lindsay Chapman.(Mathis, Rachel)
July 14, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 14, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, summons and affidavit of service against John Doe, Lindsay Chapman, filed by Helen Huff.(lgd)
July 14, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-21-223., filed by Lindsay Chapman. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents)(lgd)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Lindsay Chapman. (lgd)
July 14, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/16/2021 (lgd)
July 14, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2426500.. (Mathis, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Huff v. Chapman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Helen Huff
Represented By: Alan L. Lane
Represented By: Conrad T. Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lindsay Chapman
Represented By: Rachel Mathis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?