Woods v. Peters et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Woods
Defendant: Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark and JASP Real Estate, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05130
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Lisa Woods. (Berger, Eric)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #20 MOTION for judicial notice filed by Lisa Woods. (Berger, Eric)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 First MOTION for ServiceThird-Party Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time for Service by Lisa Woods. (Berger, Eric)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Edward Ivan Peters and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Edward Ivan Peters for service of the following document: #3 Third Party Complaint,. (Berger, Eric)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Kezhaya, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Kezhaya, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for judicial notice by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-8)(Kezhaya, Matthew)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Kezhaya, Matthew)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Lisa Woods. (Berger, Eric)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #16 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Melanie Clatanoff withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 31, 2021. (slc)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION of Melanie Clatanoff to Withdraw as Attorney by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Clatanoff, Melanie)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4 Motion for Leave to Join Parties)(Marts, Gary) Modified text on 8/16/2021 (lgd).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #13 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on August 13, 2021. (ee)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion to Remand by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Reply in Support of Motion to Remand)(Marts, Gary)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #8 MOTION to Remand filed by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Zoran's second amended complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court docket sheet)(Kezhaya, Matthew)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew A. Kezhaya on behalf of JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Kezhaya, Matthew)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DUE TO DEFICIENT SERVICE filed by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Affidavit of Eric Berger)(Marts, Gary)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand by Lisa Woods. (Marts, Gary)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Remand by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Petition for Execution of Trust Administration Declaration of Rights & Breach of Trust, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 Counter-Petition, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 Order)(Marts, Gary)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D. Marts, Jr on behalf of Lisa Woods. (Marts, Gary)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 9/29/2021 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/2/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on July 27, 2021. (slc)
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction DUE TO DEFICIENT SERVICE by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (Clatanoff, Melanie)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER requiring parties to request a trial by jury within 14 days from date of this order, if desired and allowed by law. (tg)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STATE COURT THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT, Probate Division, against JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark, filed by Lisa Woods. (Attachments: #1 state court summons and affidavit of service)(lgd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2021: #2 State Court Probate Division Ex Parte Orders) (lgd).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court Probate Division, case number 04PR-19-356., filed by Jennifer Ann Stark, JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters. (Attachments: #1 State Court documents, complaint, #2 state court summons issued and affidavit of service, exhibits)(lgd) Modified text on 7/20/2021 (lgd). (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2021: #3 State Court Ex Parte Orders) (lgd).
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by JASP Real Estate, LLC, Edward Ivan Peters, Jennifer Ann Stark. (lgd)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Removal, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2429239.. (Clatanoff, Melanie)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 7/22/2021 (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods v. Peters et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Woods
Represented By: Caley B. Vo
Represented By: Eric Berger
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Ivan Peters
Represented By: Melanie Clatanoff
Represented By: Matthew A. Kezhaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Ann Stark
Represented By: Melanie Clatanoff
Represented By: Matthew A. Kezhaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JASP Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Melanie Clatanoff
Represented By: Matthew A. Kezhaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?