Gipson v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Alice Gipson
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2021cv05136
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2671
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Hannah Hungate on behalf of Alice Gipson. (Hungate, Hannah)
September 3, 2021 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, filed by Alice Gipson. United States of America served on 8/2/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Sharits, Monte)
July 27, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Matt L. Lindsay on behalf of Alice Gipson. (Lindsay, Matt)
July 27, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Alan L. Lane on behalf of Alice Gipson. (Lane, Alan)
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 ***PLEASE DISREGARD FILED INCORRECTLY***NOTICE of Appearance by Monte A. Sharits on behalf of Alice Gipson. (Sharits, Monte) Modified on 7/27/2021 (lgd).
July 27, 2021 Filing 9 PLEASE DISREGARD FILED INCORRECTLY***NOTICE of Appearance by Monte A. Sharits on behalf of Alice Gipson. (Sharits, Monte) Modified on 7/27/2021 (lgd).
July 26, 2021 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) (lgd). (tg).
July 26, 2021 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to David Clay Fowlkes, acting U.S. Attorney for the Western District of Arkansas for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sharits, Monte)
July 26, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sharits, Monte)
July 26, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Department of Veterans Affairs for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sharits, Monte)
July 26, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Department of Veterans Affairs-Office of Chief Counsel for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Sharits, Monte)
July 26, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Alice Gipson. Complaint, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Alan Lane and Matthew Lindsay. (src)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT Alice Gipson, as Special Administratrix of the Estate of Boyd Gipson, Deceased against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2431146), filed by Alice Gipson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Sharits, Monte)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Alice Gipson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gipson v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Gipson
Represented By: Monte A. Sharits
Represented By: Alan L. Lane
Represented By: Hannah Hungate
Represented By: Matt L. Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?