Celo Logistics, LLC v. Crossroads Transport Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Celo Logistics, LLC
Defendant: Crossroads Transport Services, LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05151
Filed: August 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC.(Williams, Taylor)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #5 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. An #14 amended complaint has been filed. "It is well-established that an amended complaint supercedes an original complaint and renders the original complaint without legal effect." See In re Atlas Van Lines, Inc., 209 F.3d 1064, 1067 (8th Cir. 2000). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2021. (hfh)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT as to #4 Complaint against All Parties , filed by Celo Logistics, LLC. Related document: #4 Complaint filed by Celo Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit)(Buckley, William)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 OPINION AND ORDER granting #8 Motion to file an Amended Complaint ( Amended Complaint due by 10/14/2021). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 30, 2021. (tg)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 27, 2021. (jas)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #8 Response to Motion by Celo Logistics, LLC. (Buckley, William)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Celo Logistics, LLC. (Buckley, William)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/4/2021. Jury Trial set for 7/25/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on August 26, 2021. (jas)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (Williams, Taylor)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Removal filing fee paid re Clerk's Notice Regarding Filing Fee,, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2448501.. (Williams, Taylor)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Crossroads Transport Services, LLC, filed by Celo Logistics, LLC.(tg)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (tg)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Benton County, case number 04CV-21-1065., filed by Crossroads Transport Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(tg)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #1 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 8/26/2021 (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Celo Logistics, LLC v. Crossroads Transport Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celo Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Ashleigh R. Buckley
Represented By: William Arthur Buckley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crossroads Transport Services, LLC
Represented By: Taylor Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?