Becker v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Amanda Becker
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv05152
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 19, 2021. (jas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Bennett, Justin)
October 12, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Amanda Becker. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 9/1/2021, answer due 9/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Mail Receipt)(White, Seth)
September 21, 2021 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/28/2021. Jury Trial set for 8/29/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on September 21, 2021. (jas)
September 20, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Bennett, Justin)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
August 25, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
August 25, 2021 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (White, Seth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2448100), filed by Amanda Becker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Demand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Offer)(White, Seth)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Amanda Becker. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Becker v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Becker
Represented By: Seth A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Justin G Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?