Nelle v. Huntsville School District
Plaintiff: Rebecca Nelle
Defendant: Huntsville School District
Intervenor: Madison County Record, INC.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05158
Filed: September 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 8, 2021. (tg)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff's responses to #10 Motion for Relief to Limit Pretrial Publicity and 13 Motion to Seal Case are now due November 9, 2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 5, 2021. (glk)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 MOTION for Relief to Limit Pretrial Publicity, 13 MOTION to Seal Case by Rebecca Nelle. (Sexton, Sam)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Lee Fryar on behalf of Huntsville School District. (Fryar, Matthew)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #15 MOTION to Intervene filed by Huntsville School District. (Fryar, Matthew)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ONLY ORDER directing the Clerk to seal #2 the Complaint, pending the resolution of 13 Motion to Seal Case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 1, 2021. (glk)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Noah Watson on behalf of Madison County Record, INC.. (Watson, Noah)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #15 MOTION to Intervene by Madison County Record, INC.. (Tull, John)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Madison County Record, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Tull, John)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Motion to Seal Document. Defendant is granted leave to file its proposed motion as a sealed docket entry. The Clerk is directed to seal attachments 1 and 2 to #9 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 25, 2021. (glk)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #10 Motion to Limit Pretrial Publicity by Huntsville School District. (Zega, Steven) Modified on 10/25/2021 to add link(tg).
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Relief to Limit Pretrial Publicity by Huntsville School District. (Zega, Steven)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Seal Document by Huntsville School District. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Motion to Seal Case, #2 Brief ISO Motion to Seal Case)(Zega, Steven) Modified to grant access to restricted documents on 10/25/2021 (lgd).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/4/2022 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/22/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 7, 2021. (slc)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles L Harwell on behalf of Huntsville School District. (Harwell, Charles)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Huntsville School District.(Zega, Steven)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (src)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Huntsville School District and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (src)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Sexton, Sam)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Huntsville School District, filed by Rebecca Nelle.(Sexton, Sam) Modified to grant access to applicable parties on 11/1/2021 (lgd).
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Rebecca Nelle. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (src)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Complaint filing fee paid re #2 Complaint : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2456891.. (Sexton, Sam)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/13/2021 (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelle v. Huntsville School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Nelle
Represented By: Joey McCutchen
Represented By: Sam Sexton
Represented By: Stephen Anthony Napurano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntsville School District
Represented By: Charles L Harwell
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fryar
Represented By: Steven S. Zega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Madison County Record, INC.
Represented By: John Earle Tull, III
Represented By: Noah Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?