Marcum v. Preformed Line Products Company
Plaintiff: Bradley Marcum
Defendant: Preformed Line Products Company
Case Number: 5:2021cv05180
Filed: October 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2021 Filing 16 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on December 2, 2021. (jas)
December 2, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Preformed Line Products Company. (Madison, Eva)
December 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of Preformed Line Products Company. (Madison, Eva)
December 2, 2021 Filing 13 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Bradley Marcum. (Schuldt, Renee)
November 15, 2021 Filing 12 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Margaret Benson withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on November 15, 2021. (hfh)
November 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION of Maggie Benson to Withdraw as Attorney by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret)
October 18, 2021 Filing 10 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/24/2021. Jury Trial set for 9/26/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 18, 2021. (jas)
October 18, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Preformed Line Products Company.(Benson, Margaret)
October 18, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Ryder Wentz on behalf of Preformed Line Products Company. (Wentz, Amy)
October 13, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amy Wentz is directed to immediately register for Pro Hac Vice filer access through PACER and enter her appearance in this matter. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on October 13, 2021. (jas)
October 13, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Attorney Amy Wentz to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2475667) by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret)
October 13, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preformed Line Products Company. (Benson, Margaret)
October 13, 2021 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
October 13, 2021 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Preformed Line Products Company, filed by Bradley Marcum.(lgd)
October 13, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Benton County Circuit Court, case number 04CV-21-2149., filed by Preformed Line Products Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint documents)(lgd)
October 13, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Preformed Line Products Company. (lgd)
October 13, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 10/15/2021 (lgd)
October 13, 2021 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2475649.. (Benson, Margaret)
October 13, 2021 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorney(s) listed on Complaint #3 is (are) not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas:Renee S. Schuldt. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marcum v. Preformed Line Products Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Marcum
Represented By: Renee S. Schuldt
Represented By: Renee Samara Schuldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preformed Line Products Company
Represented By: Margaret Benson
Represented By: Amy Ryder Wentz
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?