Jaeger v. Thurman et al
Plaintiff: Donella Jaeger
Defendant: William Thurman, Mariteq Processors LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC and Redbird Bioscience Global LLC
Case Number: 5:2021cv05189
Filed: October 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 e
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mariteq Processors LLC. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
December 6, 2021 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redbird Bioscience Global LLC. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
December 6, 2021 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
November 19, 2021 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 2/2/2022 03:00 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/29/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 19, 2021. (slc)
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James H Bingaman on behalf of William Thurman. (Bingaman, James)
November 17, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, with Jury Demand by William Thurman.(Lovelace, Jerry)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kerri E. Kobbeman on behalf of Mariteq Processors LLC, Redbird Bioscience Global LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC. (Kobbeman, Kerri)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Mariteq Processors LLC, Redbird Bioscience Global LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC.(Jones, Robert)
October 27, 2021 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Mariteq Processors LLC, Redbird Bioscience Global LLC, Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC, William Thurman and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg) (tg).
October 27, 2021 Filing 5 ***DISREGARD DUPLICATE ENTRY*** Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg) Modified on 10/27/2021 (tg).
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to All Defendants for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Rozzell, George)
October 26, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
October 26, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2483713), filed by Donella Jaeger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Filed EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B - EEOC Notice of Right to Sue)(Rozzell, George)
October 26, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Donella Jaeger. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jaeger v. Thurman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donella Jaeger
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Thurman
Represented By: Jerry L. Lovelace
Represented By: James H Bingaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariteq Processors LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Jones, III
Represented By: Kerri E. Kobbeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redbird Bioscience Oklahoma LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Jones, III
Represented By: Kerri E. Kobbeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redbird Bioscience Global LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Jones, III
Represented By: Kerri E. Kobbeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?