McKinney v. Curtis International, LTD.
Plaintiff: Bret B. McKinney doing business as Bret B. McKinney, Inc.
Defendant: Curtis International, LTD.
Case Number: 5:2021cv05199
Filed: November 17, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2022 Filing 18 CLERK'S ORDER Dismissing Case re #17 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case filed by Bret B. McKinney (CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE). (tg)
January 5, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Bret B. McKinney . (Mack, Zachary)
December 30, 2021 Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Martin A. Kasten and James M. Simpson are withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove their names from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 30, 2021. (ee)
December 28, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION of James M. Simpson and Martin A. Kasten to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant by Curtis International, LTD.. (Simpson, James)
December 28, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard T. Donovan on behalf of Curtis International, LTD.. (Donovan, Richard)
December 27, 2021 Filing 13 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Curtis International, LTD's answer is due on 12/30/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 27, 2021. (ee)
December 27, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Curtis International, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Simpson, James)
December 9, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The Answer will be due on 12/27/2021. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on December 9, 2021. (ee)
December 8, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Curtis International, LTD.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kasten, Martin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Martin A. Kasten on behalf of Curtis International, LTD.. (Kasten, Martin)
December 8, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Simpson on behalf of Curtis International, LTD.. (Simpson, James)
November 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bret B. McKinney. (Mack, Zachary)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - WRONG DOCUMENT ATTACHED*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bret B. McKinney. Curtis International, LTD. served on 11/19/2021, answer due 12/10/2021. (Mack, Zachary) Modified text n 11/23/2021 (lgd).
November 18, 2021 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Curtis International, LTD. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Curtis International Ltd for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Mack, Zachary)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
November 17, 2021 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Curtis International, LTD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2497378), filed by Bret B. McKinney.(Mack, Zachary)
November 17, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Bret B. McKinney. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McKinney v. Curtis International, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret B. McKinney doing business as Bret B. McKinney, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Babcock Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis International, LTD.
Represented By: Richard T. Donovan
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Represented By: Martin A. Kasten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?