Brandt v. Township Provisions, LLC
Plaintiff: Ryan Brandt
Defendant: Township Provisions, LLC and Township Provisions, LLC doing business as Oven & Tap
Case Number: 5:2021cv05232
Filed: December 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 203 Equal Pay Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ONLY ORDER denying #19 Motion to Extend. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 24, 2022. (jch)
February 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION to Extend (Suspend) Rule 26(f) Deadlines in the Initial Scheduling Order by Township Provisions, LLC. (Neal, Emily)
February 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 EXHIBIT to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Exhibit A by Township Provisions, LLC. (Eldridge, Conner) Modified text on 2/24/2022 (lgd).
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), #12 Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Township Provisions, LLC. (Eldridge, Conner)
February 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Township Provisions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Eldridge, Conner) (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/16/2022) (jlm).
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Plaintiff Ryan Brandt. Amended Complaint #12 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney, who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: T.J. Fosko. (hnc)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ORDER finding as moot #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. An #12 amended complaint has been filed. "It is well-established that an amended complaint supercedes an original complaint and renders the original complaint without legal effect." See in re Atlas Van Lines, Inc., 209 F.3d 1064, 1067 (8th Cir. 2000). Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on February 2, 2022. (hfh)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #13 Response to Motion to Dismiss by Ryan Brandt. (Horton, William)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) filed by Ryan Brandt. (Horton, William)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #2 Complaint against Ryan Brandt , filed by Ryan Brandt. Related document: #2 Complaint filed by Ryan Brandt.(Horton, William)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/4/2022. Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on January 26, 2022. (jas)
January 26, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks no longer assigned to the case. (src)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION To Extend Discovery Deadline by Township Provisions, LLC. (Neal, Emily)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Township Provisions, LLC. (Eldridge, Conner)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Township Provisions, LLC. (Eldridge, Conner)
January 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) by Township Provisions, LLC. (Eldridge, Conner)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Requests for Admissions, filed by Ryan Brandt. Township Provisions, LLC served on 12/30/2021, answer due 1/20/2022. (Horton, William)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Township Provisions, LLC and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished.(lgd)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Township Provisions, LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Horton, William)
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Township Provisions, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2516027), filed by Ryan Brandt.(Horton, William) Modified text on 1/7/2022 (lgd).
December 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET for case initiated by Ryan Brandt. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day your case may be terminated. (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandt v. Township Provisions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ryan Brandt
Represented By: William Gene Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township Provisions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Township Provisions, LLC doing business as Oven & Tap
Represented By: Conner Eldridge
Represented By: Emily Aura Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?