Fillmore v. Washington County, Arkansas et al
Plaintiff: Steve Fillmore
Defendant: Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson and Jeff Crowder
Case Number: 5:2022cv05044
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2022 Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER, as set forth: Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 18, 2022. (jas)
April 14, 2022 Filing 10 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson. (Neemann, Camille)
March 10, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Camille Marie Neemann on behalf of Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson. (Neemann, Camille)
March 9, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE by Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson re #2 Notice of Removal, SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27)(Young, H.)
March 9, 2022 Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/15/2022. Jury Trial set for 2/27/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on March 9, 2022. (jas)
March 9, 2022 Filing 6 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 9, 2022 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Amended State Court Complaint by Washington County, Arkansas, Jeff Crowder, Michael Watson.(lgd) Modified parties on 5/4/2022 (bjb).
March 9, 2022 Filing 4 AMENDED STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand as to #3 Complaint against Washington County, Arkansas, Jeff Crowder, Michael Watson, filed by Steve Fillmore. Related document: #3 Complaint filed by Steve Fillmore.(lgd)
March 9, 2022 Filing 3 STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson, filed by Steve Fillmore.(lgd)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Washington County Circuit Court, case number 72CV-21-787, filed by Washington County, Arkansas, Jeff Crowder, Michael Watson. (Attachments: #1 State court complaint, #2 State court amended complaint, #3 State court Answer to complaint)(lgd)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson. (lgd)
March 9, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Notice of Removal,. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/11/2022 (lgd)
March 9, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE re Multiple Attorneys Listed on Pleading directed to Defendants Jeff Crowder, Washington County, Arkansas, Michael Watson. Notice of Removal, #2 lists multiple attorneys appearing for the filer. The following attorney(s), who did not sign the pleading, must enter a separate Notice of Appearance in order to receive electronic notification of future activity in the case: Camille M. Neemann. (lgd)
March 9, 2022 Notice of Removal filing fee paid re #2 Notice of Removal, : $ 402, receipt number AARWDC-2556701.. (Young, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fillmore v. Washington County, Arkansas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Fillmore
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County, Arkansas
Represented By: H. Wayne Young, Jr.
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Watson
Represented By: H. Wayne Young, Jr.
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Crowder
Represented By: H. Wayne Young, Jr.
Represented By: Camille Marie Neemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?