Campau v. Sweetser et al
Plaintiff: Sarah Campau
Defendant: Michael A. Sweetser, The Sweetser Family L.P., Bert Morris and Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II
Case Number: 5:2022cv05051
Filed: March 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Mary Elizabeth Goff withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his/her name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 18, 2022. (tg)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Cameron Thomas Bowden on behalf of Sarah Campau. (Bowden, Cameron)
May 16, 2022 Filing 15 First MOTION of Mary Goff to Withdraw as Attorney by Sarah Campau. (Goff, Mary)
April 18, 2022 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/25/2022. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 18, 2022. (jas) (lgd).
April 15, 2022 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Bert Morris, Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II, The Sweetser Family L.P..(Bennett, Justin)
April 14, 2022 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Sarah Campau. Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. (Goff, Mary) Modified defendant name on 4/14/2022 (jas).
April 14, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Sarah Campau. The Sweetser Family L.P. served on 4/6/2022, answer due 4/27/2022. (Goff, Mary)
April 13, 2022 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Sarah Campau. Bert Morris served on 3/28/2022, answer due 4/18/2022. (Goff, Mary)
March 25, 2022 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Honorable Timothy L. Brooks no longer assigned to the case. (tg)
March 24, 2022 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II, The Sweetser Family L.P. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
March 24, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to The Sweetser Family, L.P. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Goff, Mary)
March 24, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Goff, Mary)
March 24, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Bert Morris, Michael A. Sweetser, The Sweetser Family L.P. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
March 24, 2022 Complaint fee received: $402.00, receipt number AARWDC-2564332.(mll)
March 23, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Bert Morris for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Goff, Mary)
March 23, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Michael Sweetser for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Goff, Mary)
March 23, 2022 Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (tg)
March 22, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $402.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 3/24/2022.(mll)
March 21, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Sarah Campau.(Goff, Mary)
March 21, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sarah Campau. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campau v. Sweetser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Campau
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Goff
Represented By: Cameron Thomas Bowden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Sweetser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Sweetser Family L.P.
Represented By: Justin G Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Morris
Represented By: Justin G Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Sweetser Trust No. II
Represented By: Justin G Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?