Burgos v. Roughton et al
Plaintiff: Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr.
Defendant: Detective Michael Roughton, Detective Joshua Butler, Detective Johas Edgmon, Detective Aaron Rutledge and Technician Heather L. Bradshaw
Case Number: 5:2022cv05052
Filed: March 24, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Christy D Comstock
Referring Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr. Heather L. Bradshaw served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Joshua Butler served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Johas Edgmon served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Michael Roughton served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022; Aaron Rutledge served on 5/16/2022, answer due 6/6/2022. (lgd)
April 26, 2022 Filing 9 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Heather L. Bradshaw, Joshua Butler, Johas Edgmon, Michael Roughton, Aaron Rutledge and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #8 Order Directing Service, #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983), #5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (bjb) (tg).
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Heather L. Bradshaw, Joshua Butler, Johas Edgmon, Michael Roughton, Aaron Rutledge and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 26, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(bjb)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER ADOPTING #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiffs due process claims are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs complaint otherwise remains pending and this case remains referred. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on April 26, 2022. (tg)
April 7, 2022 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #1 Complaint Referred (42:1983) filed by Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr.. Objections to R&R due by 4/25/2022. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on April 7, 2022. (tg)
March 24, 2022 Filing 5 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 24, 2022 Filing 4 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Benton County Detention Center to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $128.26; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Benton County Detention Center). (lgd) Modified text on 3/24/2022 (lgd).
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350; ORDER directing the Clerk to file the in forma pauperis (IFP) application and complaint submitted by the Plaintiff. A determination regarding his status as a pauper and service of process will be made at a later time. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of his new address. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on March 24, 2022. (lgd)
March 24, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr. Motions referred to Christy D. Comstock.(lgd)
March 24, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Heather L. Bradshaw, Joshua Butler, Johas Edgmon, Michael Roughton, Aaron Rutledge, filed by Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr.(lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgos v. Roughton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto Luis Burgos, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Michael Roughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Joshua Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Johas Edgmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Aaron Rutledge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technician Heather L. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?