FCCI Insurance Company v. Mann et al
Plaintiff: FCCI Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffrey D Mann, Andrea L Mann and A&J Plumbing LLC
Case Number: 5:2022cv05063
Filed: April 4, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2022 Filing 14 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 7/5/2022 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 6/17/2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 5, 2022. (slc)
May 2, 2022 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FCCI Insurance Company. Andrea L Mann served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. (Grace, David)
May 2, 2022 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by FCCI Insurance Company. Jeffrey D Mann served on 4/7/2022, answer due 4/28/2022. (Grace, David)
April 29, 2022 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Jeffrey D Mann.(bjb)
April 28, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Andrea L Mann.(bjb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR REFUND OF FEES PAID ELECTRONICALLY with Pay.gov Tracking ID AARWDC-2571216 by FCCI Insurance Company. (Grace, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to A&J Plumbing LLC, Andrea L Mann, Jeffrey D Mann and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 7 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
April 5, 2022 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to A & J Plumbing LLC for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Grace, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Andrea L. Mann for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Grace, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Jeffrey D. Mann for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Grace, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FCCI Insurance Company. (Grace, David)
April 5, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2571496), filed by FCCI Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - General Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Forrest City Performance and Payment Bonds, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Grand Forks Performance and Payment Bonds)(Grace, David)
April 4, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FCCI Insurance Company. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FCCI Insurance Company v. Mann et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FCCI Insurance Company
Represented By: David A. Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea L Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&J Plumbing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?