Schug et al v. MCC Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jim Schug and Anna Schug
Defendant: MCC Group Holdings, Inc., Scott Barrows and Frederick "Hex" Bisbee, Jr.
Case Number: 5:2022cv05101
Filed: May 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: P K Holmes
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 9/6/2022 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable Christy D. Comstock. Each party shall provide a concise, confidential settlement statement NO LATER THAN ONE WEEK PRIOR TO THE SCHEDULED CONFERENCE via email to CDCsettle@arwd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on July 20, 2022. (rg)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEXT ONLY ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 32 of this Court, the parties are directed to participate in a settlement conference before United States Magistrate Judge Christy D. Comstock. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on July 14, 2022. (mer)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Anna Schug, Jim Schug. (Eldridge, Conner)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Clifford W. Plunkett on behalf of All Defendants. (Plunkett, Clifford)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/28/2022. Bench Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Fayetteville - 2nd flr (Rm 210) before Honorable P. K. Holmes III. Signed by Jane Ann Short, Courtroom Deputy for Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 21, 2022. (jas)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Scott Barrows, Frederick "Hex" Bisbee, Jr, MCC Group Holdings, Inc.. (Tidwell, Bruce)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Scott Barrows, Frederick "Hex" Bisbee, Jr, MCC Group Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-Mail - Bornino)(Tidwell, Bruce)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE by Anna Schug, Jim Schug re #9 Order Directing Pleading to be Filed and Supplementation of Jurisdictional Allegations. (Eldridge, Conner)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING that a Response be filed. Document due in Response to Order by 6/15/2022. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on June 1, 2022. (tg)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT.SEALED DOCUMENT by Anna Schug, Jim Schug. An Order was entered on 5/27/2022 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to #2 Complaint, 7 Order on Motion for Leave. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K) (Eldridge, Conner)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave. Plaintiffs may file their unredacted complaint and exhibits under seal. Signed by Honorable P. K. Holmes III on May 27, 2022. (jch)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Scott Barrows, Frederick "Hex" Bisbee, Jr, MCC Group Holdings, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (bjb)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to TO FILE CERTAIN PORTIONS OF THE COMPLAINT AND TO FILE EXHIBITS THERETO UNDER SEAL by Anna Schug, Jim Schug. (Eldridge, Conner)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to MCC GROUP HOLDINGS, INC., SCOTT BARROWS, and FREDERICK HEX BISBEE, JR. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Eldridge, Conner)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AARWDC-2599437), filed by Jim Schug, Anna Schug.(Eldridge, Conner)
May 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Anna Schug, Jim Schug. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schug et al v. MCC Group Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Schug
Represented By: Conner Eldridge
Represented By: Emily Aura Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anna Schug
Represented By: Conner Eldridge
Represented By: Emily Aura Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCC Group Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce B Tidwell
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Barrows
Represented By: Bruce B Tidwell
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick "Hex" Bisbee, Jr.
Represented By: Bruce B Tidwell
Represented By: Clifford W. Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?