Standifer v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tracy Standifer
Defendant: J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2022cv05204
Filed: October 5, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Fayetteville Office
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 TEXT ONLY ORDER Resetting CASE MANAGEMENT HEARING: Case Management Hearing reset for 1/27/2023 01:30 PM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. NOTE: All deadlines set forth in the Initial Scheduling Order remain. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 9, 2022. (slc)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc..(Freeman, Karen)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #31 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney and granting #32 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Kyle Kennedy and Eva C. Madison withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove their names from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 18, 2022. (glk)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #29 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant's answer is now due 11/1/2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 17, 2022. (glk)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION of Kyle Kennedy to Withdraw as Attorney by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Kennedy, Kyle)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION of Eva C. Madison to Withdraw as Attorney by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Peyton Hildebrand on behalf of J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Hildebrand, Peyton)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Read on behalf of J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Read, Nathan)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Karen P Freeman on behalf of J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Freeman, Karen)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 1/4/2023 10:30 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/28/2022. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 13, 2022. (slc)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #23 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Curtis R. Summers withdrawn, and the Clerk of Court is directed to remove his name from the list of attorneys who receive Notices of Electronic Filing in this case. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on October 5, 2022. (ee)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Kennedy on behalf of J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Kennedy, Kyle)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION of Curtis Summers to Withdraw as Attorney by J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Eva C. Madison on behalf of J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.. (Madison, Eva)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:22-cv-02069. Docket sheet received.
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY CLERK'S NOTICE: The following attorneys are not registered for CM/ECF noticing and filing in the Western District of Arkansas: Ruth M. Benien and Curtis R. Summers. An attorney can register through PACER for a CM/ECF login and password if they are admitted to practice in the U.S. District Courts for the Eastern and Western Districts of Arkansas or are admitted pro hac vice for this case. Any non-registered attorney should submit the proper attorney admission petition or file an appropriate motion. Please refer to our website http://www.arwd.uscourts.gov/attorney-information for further information. (bjb)
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying in part and granting in part #6 Motion to Dismiss; Motion to Transfer Case. The clerk shall take all necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this case to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 10/4/2022. (ca) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order ***Civil Case Terminated.(ca) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 REPLY TO RESPONSE TO MOTION by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. re: #6 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Transfer Case (Summers, Curtis) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26 Deadlines. The deadlines in #8 Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling are stayed pending decision on #6 Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue. An Amended Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling will be entered, if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 7/21/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kf) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting as unopposed #14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue. The response deadline is extended to 7/21/2022. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/21/2022. (ams) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE by Plaintiff Tracy Standifer re #6 Motion to Dismiss, Motion to Transfer Case by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Tracy Standifer (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION for extension of time Joint Motion for Extension of Rule 26 Deadlines by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (referred to Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer) (Summers, Curtis) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting as unopposed #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time as to #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue. The response deadline is extended to 7/20/2022. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/19/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (kf) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 19, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(ala) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Second MOTION for Extension of Time as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Tracy Standifer (Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #7 Memorandum in Support of #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue. Response deadline is extended to 7/18/2022. Signed by District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/13/2022. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lml) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order MOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Motion to Dismiss or. Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case. The motion will be resolved by the District Judge. (kf) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
July 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Motion to Dismiss or. Alternatively, Motion to Transfer Venue as to #7 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #6 MOTION to Dismiss or, Alternatively to Transfer Venue MOTION to Transfer Case by Plaintiff Tracy Standifer (Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER REGARDING PLANNING AND SCHEDULING: Scheduling Conference set for 8/11/2022 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer. Participants shall dial into the conference call at 888-363-4749, enter access code 9686294#, and follow the prompts to join the call. Proposed Scheduling Order and Rule 26 Initial Disclosures due 8/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer on 6/27/22. (ala) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of #6 Motion to Dismiss or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Redacted Exhibit 1 (redacted), #2 Exhibit Declaration)(Summers, Curtis) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS OR, ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (Summers, Curtis) Added Motion to Transfer on 6/21/2022. (mam) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CLERKS ORDER EXTENDING TIME until 6/21/2022 for Defendant J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. to answer or otherwise plead. Signed by deputy clerk on 6/6/2022. (kas) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. identifying J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. as corporate parent . (Summers, Curtis) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
May 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED -- Personal Service by Tracy Standifer upon J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc served 5/17/2022, answer due 6/7/2022 (Benien, Ruth) Modified on 5/26/2022 to correct title and add service/answer dates (hw). [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order SUMMONS ISSUED as to J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (lb) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Tracy Standifer. (Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5717918.), filed by Tracy Standifer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Benien, Ruth) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (kas) [Transferred from ksd on 10/5/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Standifer v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Standifer
Represented By: Ruth M. Benien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.B Hunt Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis R. Summers
Represented By: Eva C. Madison
Represented By: Kyle Kennedy
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Read
Represented By: Karen P Freeman
Represented By: Peyton Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?