Edwards v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Phillip Carl Edwards
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2022cv05215
Filed: October 16, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Barry A Bryant
2 Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2022 TEXT ONLY MEMO OF REASSIGNMENT. Case referral reassigned to Honorable Barry A Bryant. Honorable Christy D. Comstock no longer assigned to the case. (hnc)
November 1, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Christy D. Comstock, as the referral judge. (bjb)
October 19, 2022 Filing 7 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (tg)
October 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting #3 Motion for Service and DIRECTING SERVICE on Social Security Administration Commissioner. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from the date of service. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on October 19, 2022. (tg)
October 18, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 magistrate consent)(lgd)
October 18, 2022 Filing 4 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested for USA Agency, Corporation, Officers or Employees as to Kijakazi, Acting Commr SSA and USAtty and Atty Genl Garland for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (McKinnon, Laura)
October 18, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis , MOTION for Service by Phillip Carl Edwards. (McKinnon, Laura)
October 18, 2022 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Phillip Carl Edwards.(McKinnon, Laura)
October 17, 2022 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Phillip Carl Edwards. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (tg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Carl Edwards
Represented By: Laura J. McKinnon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Office of the General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?