Ritesman v. Officer Cena, et al
Plaintiff: Cody Hawke Ritesman
Defendant: Washington County Detention Center, Officer Cena, Corporal Corley, Corporal Mulvaney and Lieutenant Brian Atchley
Case Number: 5:2022cv05219
Filed: October 25, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2022 Filing 13 ***PLEASE DISREGARD*** TEXT ONLY ORDER REGARDING In Forma Pauperis Application. Plaintiff filed a Notice of Change of Address indicating that he has now been released from custody. When a Plaintiff is released from confinement, the policy of the Court is to require re-submission of affidavits to determine whether he should be required to pay all, or a portion of, the fees and costs of the lawsuit. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, he is directed to pay the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee, or to resubmit an IFP application which reflects his free-world financial status within 21 days of the date of this Order. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED THAT: the Clerk is directed to send a blank IFP Application to the Plaintiff. Plaintiff is directed to submit the balance of the 350.00 dollar filing fee or complete and sign the IFP Application within 21 days. This case shall be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to pay the 350.00 dollar filing fee or resubmit an IFP application by the deadline. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP Completed IFP due by 1/6/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 16, 2022. (smg) Modified on 12/16/2022 (bjb).
December 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address for Cody Hawke Ritesman. There are no documents to resend. (bjb)
December 8, 2022 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Please see attached document for complete deadline information. Summary Judgment Motion due by 5/8/2023. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on December 8, 2022. (rg)
December 6, 2022 Filing 10 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Brian Atchley, Cena, Corley, Mulvaney.(Thomas, JaNan)
November 28, 2022 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cody Hawke Ritesman. Brian Atchley served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022; Cena served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022; Corley served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022; Mulvaney served on 11/17/2022, answer due 12/8/2022. (lgd)
November 3, 2022 Filing 8 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Brian Atchley, Cena, Corley, Mulvaney and USM285 Form(s) Delivered to USMS for each defendant for whom summons was issued with the following documents attached: re #4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form, #7 Order Directing Service, #6 Amended Complaint. (bjb)
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING THE MARSHALS SERVICE TO SERVE Brian Atchley, Cena, Corley, Mulvaney and granting 21 days to answer. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on November 3, 2022. (cc: U.S. Marshals Service-Certified).(bjb)
November 3, 2022 TEXT ONLY CLERK'S ORDER OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT to a District Judge. Case reassigned to presiding judge Honorable Timothy L. Brooks and Honorable Christy D. Comstock, as the referral judge. (bjb)
November 2, 2022 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Brian Atchley, Corley, Mulvaney, Cena, filed by Cody Hawke Ritesman.(bjb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 5 CLERK'S ORDER re PLRA Initial Fee directing Washington County Jail to collect from petitioner's prison account an initial partial filing fee of $24.00; thereafter to collect monthly payments from petitioner's prison account in amount equal to 20% of preceding month's income credited to account until $ 350.00 filing fee is paid in full (cc: Washington County Jail). (bjb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
October 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983). Pursuant to the provisions of the Prisoner Litigation Reform Act, the Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee from the Plaintiff.Plaintiff is advised that he is required to immediately inform the Court of any change of address. If Plaintiff is transferred to another jail or prison or released, he shall have 30 days from the date of transfer or release in which to notify the Court of the new address. Plaintiff shall submit a change of address on a separate piece of paper entitled Notice to the Court of Change of Address and not include any motions or otherwise request relief in this document. The notice shall contain only information pertaining to the address change. The case will be subject to dismissal if Plaintiff fails to inform the Court of an address change. The Clerk is directed to collect the filing fee in the amount of $ 350.00; ( Amended Complaint due by 11/14/2022). Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on October 25, 2022. (bjb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (42:1983) by Cody Hawke Ritesman. (bjb)
October 25, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT REFERRED (42:1983) against Washington County Detention Center, filed by Cody Hawke Ritesman.(bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ritesman v. Officer Cena, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Hawke Ritesman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cena
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Corley
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Mulvaney
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Brian Atchley
Represented By: JaNan Arnold Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?