Edens v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Plaintiff: Cathy Edens
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Case Number: 5:2024cv05062
Filed: March 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines as set forth. No reply briefs will be allowed without leave of court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on May 10, 2024. (slc)
May 10, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. (lgd)
May 3, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The. (Mathisen, Eric)
May 3, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The.(Mathisen, Eric)
April 12, 2024 Filing 10 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #9 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant's answer is now due on or before May 6, 2024. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 12, 2024. (gcj)
April 12, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, by agreement. by Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The. (Mathisen, Eric)
April 12, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric P. Mathisen on behalf of Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The. (Mathisen, Eric)
March 29, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Cathy Edens. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The served on 3/25/2024, answer due 4/15/2024. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit B- USPS Tracking)(Rozzell, George)
March 14, 2024 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. CORRECTED Summons Issued as to Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) Modified on 3/19/2024 (lgd).
March 14, 2024 Filing 5 ***PLEASE DISREGARD - ERROR ON SUMMONS*** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (lgd) Modified on 3/15/2024 (lgd).
March 14, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form furnished. (lgd)
March 13, 2024 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The for service of the following document: #2 Complaint,. (Rozzell, George)
March 13, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-2943900), filed by Cathy Edens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters of Administration, #2 Exhibit B - Appeal Denial)(Rozzell, George)
March 13, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Cathy Edens. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (src)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edens v. Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy Edens
Represented By: George M. Rozzell, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc., The
Represented By: Eric P. Mathisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?