Nelson v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nelson
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 5:2024cv05124
Filed: June 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jennifer Nelson. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company was sent waiver on 6/14/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (McNamara, John)
June 7, 2024 Filing 5 TEXT ONLY ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. J PRICE McNAMARA appearing for Plaintiff. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on June 7, 2024. (slc)
June 7, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (bjb)
June 7, 2024 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, filed by Jennifer Nelson.(bjb)
June 7, 2024 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #3 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 6/10/2024 (bjb)
June 7, 2024 Complaint filing fee paid re #3 Complaint : $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-2996456.. (McNamara, John)
June 6, 2024 Filing 2 MOTION for Attorney J Price McNamara to Appear Pro Hac Vice (PHV Application fee paid $ 100; receipt number AARWDC-2995641) by Jennifer Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Complaint)(McNamara, John)
June 6, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jennifer Nelson. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (bjb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Lincoln National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Nelson
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Represented By: John Price McNamara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?