Frazier v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Plaintiff: Clarence Edward Frazier, II
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 5:2024cv05186
Filed: September 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0405 g Review of HHS Decision (RSI)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Social Security Administration Commissioner answer due 1/3/2025. Signed by Honorable Christy D. Comstock on October 30, 2024. (ria) Modified text on 10/31/2024 (lgd).
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Friesen, Joletta)
October 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Joletta Friesen on behalf of Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Friesen, Joletta)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONSENT TO ASSIGNMENT to U.S. Magistrate Judge by Clarence Edward Frazier, II. Government consent acknowledged pursuant to Standing Consent Letter. (Wilmoth, Sammi)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 9/3/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. (lgd)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Complaint fee received: $ 405, receipt number AARWDC-3046805. (lgd)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF DIRECT ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This case has been assigned to a U.S. Magistrate Judge to conduct all proceedings and for entry of a final judgment. You must file the attached form memorializing consent or requesting reassignment to a District Judge within fourteen (14) days. Consent or Reassignment form due by 9/17/2024. (lgd)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING FILING FEE. The following document was received and filed without the appropriate filing fee: #2 Complaint. You MUST pay the filing fee of $ 405.00 or file a motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis, if appropriate, within 2 business days.If the proper fees or motion are not received for case initiating documents, your case may be subject to dismissal.Present your payment to the appropriate Divisional Office or Pay Online, using the Civil -> Other Documents -> Filing Fee Submitted event. Filing Fee due by 9/5/2024 (lgd)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ***PLEASE DISREGARD FILED IN ERROR*** THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Wilmoth, Sammi) Modified on 9/4/2024 (lgd).
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner, filed by Clarence Edward Frazier, II.(Wilmoth, Sammi)
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Clarence Edward Frazier, II. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s).If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (lgd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frazier v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Represented By: Candace L. Taylor
Represented By: USAARW Social Security
Represented By: Joletta Friesen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence Edward Frazier, II
Represented By: Sammi Wilmoth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?