Barron v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dalton Barron
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and Wachter, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2024cv05210
Filed: October 7, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Presiding Judge: Timothy L Brooks
Referring Judge: Christy D Comstock
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER setting deadlines. No reply briefs will be allowed without leave of court. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on November 19, 2024. (slc)
November 19, 2024 CASE REFERRED to Honorable Christy D. Comstock. (jlm)
November 8, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company. (Donovan, David)
November 8, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Donovan, David)
November 5, 2024 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wachter, Inc.. (Kiesewetter, Jennifer)
November 5, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Wachter, Inc..(Kiesewetter, Jennifer)
October 23, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Dalton Barron. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company served on 10/21/2024, answer due 11/12/2024. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 22, 2024 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons, filed by Dalton Barron. Wachter, Inc. served on 10/15/2024, answer due 11/5/2024. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 8, 2024 Filing 6 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, Wachter, Inc and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED.(mll)
October 8, 2024 Filing 5 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and Wachter, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon)
October 8, 2024 Filing 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form provided (ria)
October 7, 2024 Filing 3 THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. ***DISREGARD - SUMMONS MUST BE PROVIDED FOR BOTH DEFENDANTS*** Summons Requested as to United of Omaha Life Insurance Company and Wachter, Inc. for service of the following document: #2 Complaint. (Lacy, Brandon) Modified on 10/7/2024 (bjb).
October 7, 2024 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, Wachter, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3067117), filed by Dalton Barron.(Lacy, Brandon)
October 7, 2024 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dalton Barron. Please proceed with filing your case initiating documents.If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed.A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3).(mll)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. United of Omaha Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dalton Barron
Represented By: Brandon W. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United of Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachter, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Kiesewetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?