Parrish v. Ball et al

Case Number: 6:2006cv06024
Filed: June 9, 2006
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 5, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in accordance with 78 Mandate of USCA, in favor of Summer Parrish and against Joseph Stephen Fite in his individual capacity. Plaintiff's claims against Joseph Fite and Sheriff Ron Ball in their official capacities are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on March 5, 2010. (cap)
October 7, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER that judgment is for the plaintiff for $30,000 of compensatory damages and $100,000 of punitive damages; further the court apportions $15,000 of the compensatory damages to defendants Ball and Fite in their official capacities and the court apportions the remaining $15,000 of compensatory damages to defendant Fite in his individual capacity; further defendant Fite in his individual capacity, is liable for the entire $100,000 of punitive damag es and plaintiff's costs and attorney's fees are to be born jointly and severally by all defendants. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 7, 2008. (rw) Modified on 10/8/2008 to edit text(rw). Modified on 10/20/2008 to edit text (dmc).
February 5, 2008 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING 31 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment with regard to Separate Defendant Hot Spring County Sheriff's Department, Separate Defendant Hot Spring County, and Separate Defendant Sheriff Ball in his individually capacity; and DENIED with regard to Separate Defendant Sheriff Ball in his official capacity. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 5, 2008. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish v. Ball et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?