McCraven v. Sanders et al

Plaintiff: Jan McCraven
Defendant: Larry Sanders, Mel Steed, Lieutenant McMurrian, Sgt. Radley, Dan Ansley, Forrest L Marks, Dodge, J.D. Henry, Tommy L. Harmon, LPN and Nick Dodd
Case Number: 6:2007cv06019
Filed: April 2, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 117 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on February 11, 2010. (dmc)
December 29, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 111 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 29, 2009. (dmc)
December 1, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion in Limine; granting 98 Motion for Twelve Person Jury. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on December 1, 2009. (dmc)
October 22, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STAYING CASE including the trial scheduled to begin Monday,October 27, pending the Eighth Circuits ruling. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 22, 2008. (dmc)
October 21, 2008 71 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER granting in part and denying in part 49 Motion for Summary Judgment; Defendants Steed and Sanders's Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and Plaintiffs claims concerning individual capacity liability under both & #167; 1983 and the Arkansas Civil Rights Act are DISMISSED; Defendants John Henry, Judy McMurrian, Ronald Radley, Donald Ansley, John Dodge, and Tommy Harmons Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. This case remains set for trial on October 27, 2008. Larry Sanders and Mel Steed terminated. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on October 21, 2008. (dmc) Modified on 10/22/2008 to edit text (dmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCraven v. Sanders et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jan McCraven
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sanders
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mel Steed
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant McMurrian
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Radley
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Ansley
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest L Marks
Represented By: Matthew Blayne McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dodge
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.D. Henry
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tommy L. Harmon, LPN
Represented By: Ralph C. Ohm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nick Dodd
Represented By: Angela R. Echols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?