Wallace v. Social Security Administration Commissioner

Plaintiff: Raymond Lloyd Wallace
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Case Number: 6:2007cv06048
Filed: June 25, 2007
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Hot Springs Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2008 10 Featured Case ORDER REMANDING CASE TO US AGENCY pursuant to sentence six of 42 U.S.C. 405(g). Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2008. (lw)
June 11, 2008 9 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on June 11, 2008. (lw)
October 18, 2007 8 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Social Security Administration Commissioner. (Webb, Mark)
September 20, 2007 7 APPEAL BRIEF (SOCIAL SECURITY) by Raymond Lloyd Wallace. (Attachments: # 1 Medical Records Part 1; # 2 Medical Records Part 2)(Carroll, Shannon) Modified on 9/21/2007 to name attachments (dmc).
September 10, 2007 Featured Case TEXT ONLY SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER. Plaintiff must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date of the filing of the transcript or October 4, 2007. The brief must identify specific points for appeal. Plaintiff's failure to file a timely brief may result in dismissal for failure to prosecute. Defendant must file a brief within thirty (30) days of the date Plaintiff's brief is served. Defendant's brief must respond to the issues raised in Plaintiff's brief and may include additional relevant issues. The brief should be no longer than twenty (20) pages in length. Any brief exceeding the page limitation imposed herein may be stricken from the record.Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on September 10, 2007. (lmg)
September 4, 2007 This is a text only entry - No Document is attached. Paper document filed with Clerk.SOCIAL SECURITY TRANSCRIPT by Social Security Administration Commissioner. Plaintiffs SSA Appeal Brief due by 10/4/2007. Government SSA Appeal Brief due by 11/5/2007. (cap)
August 31, 2007 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Social Security Administration Commissioner.(Webb, Mark)
July 20, 2007 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint, filed by Raymond Lloyd Wallace. Social Security Administration Commissioner served on 7/2/2007, answer due 9/1/2007. (Attachments: # 1)(Carroll, Shannon) Modified on 7/26/2007 to correct text (dmc).
July 9, 2007 4 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Barry A. Bryant. Signed by Judge Robert T. Dawson on July 9, 2007. (Attachments: # 1 Plaintiff's Consent# 2 Government's Consent)(dkg)
June 25, 2007 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and returned to attorney for service. (dmc)
June 25, 2007 3 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is directed to file the complaint nunc pro tunc as of 6/18/2007. The plaintiff is directed to serve a copy of the complaint and this order on the defendant by certified mail, return receipt requested, as well as the US Attorney General and US Attorney for Western District/Arkansas without prepayment of fees and costs. Defendant is to answer within 60 days from date of service . Signed by Judge Barry A. Bryant on 6/25/2007. (dmc)
June 25, 2007 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Raymond Lloyd Wallace. (dmc)
June 25, 2007 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration Commissioner filed nunc pro tunc as of 6/18/2007, by Raymond Lloyd Wallace.(dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Lloyd Wallace
Represented By: Shannon Muse Carroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?