Garner v. Sanders

Plaintiff: Charles Dean Garner
Defendant: Larry Sanders
Case Number: 6:2008cv06031
Filed: March 27, 2008
Court: Arkansas Western District Court
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Garland
Referring Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 27, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing case without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on January 27, 2010. (dmc)
September 4, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 31 Report and Recommendations, granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Sgt. Ansley, Larry Sanders. Accordingly, Plaintiff's claim of unconstitutional conditi ons of confinement is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Further, Plaintiff's claim for denial of medical care against Sheriff Sanders is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and Sheriff Sanders is dismissed as a defendant. This matter will proceed with Plaintiff's denial of medical care claim against Sgt. Ansley. Larry Sanders terminated.. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on September 4, 2009. (cap)
July 20, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 23 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Sgt. Ansley, Larry Sanders. Objections to R&R due by 8/6/2009. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on July 20, 2009. (dmc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garner v. Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dean Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Sanders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?