Brown v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Defendant: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections, Brown, Janna Lock, Saunders and Mike Pippin
Case Number: 6:2009cv06034
Filed: April 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Arkansas
Office: Habeas Corpus (Prison Condition) Office
County: Hot Spring
Presiding Judge: Barry A. Bryant
Presiding Judge: Robert T. Dawson
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS for 36 Report and Recommendations, granting 35 Motion to Withdraw filed by Daniel Ray Brown; granting 35 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Daniel Ray Brown, the Complaint is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on November 29, 2010. (dmc)
November 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 35 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Daniel Ray Brown. Objections to R&R due by 11/26/2010. Signed by Honorable Barry A. Bryant on November 8, 2010. (dmc)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety for 16 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Brown, Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections, Mike Pippin, Ernest Sanders, Jr.; Gra nting 12 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by separate defendants Brown, Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections, Mike Pippin, Ernest Sanders, Jr., Plaintiffs claim against Janna Lock for denial of adequate medical care remains. Signed by Honorable Robert T. Dawson on April 28, 2010. (dmc) Modified on 4/29/2010 to edit text(dmc). NEF Regenerated
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Ray Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Norris, Director, Arkansas Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janna Lock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saunders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Pippin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?